West v. Sconyers et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: James Robert West, Jr.
Defendant: Captain Sconyers, Shawn Logan, Gerald Wright, C.O. I. Campbell, Joel Tew and Sergeant Peavey
Case Number: 2:2008cv00082
Filed: February 7, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the 78 Motion for New Trial is DENIED as further set out in the order. It is further ORDERED that West's 81 Motion for Extension of Time is DENIED as further set out in the order. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 5/5/2011. (dmn)
March 17, 2011 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 68 MOTION to Reschedule Trial Date. It is hereby ORDERED that Oral Argument will be heard on the motion on 3/21/2011 before Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller. The parties are directed to continue their trial preparations as if the case will be tried during the term of court in which the case is currently set. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 3/17/2011. Copies furnished to HC, KG. (dmn)
November 22, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: It is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that: 1. The 43 RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED. 2. Defendants' motions for summary judgment on plaintiff's excessive force claim (Doc. 26 , 31 ) are DENIED. 3. The plaintiff's § 1983 excessive force claim will be set for trial by jury. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 11/22/2010. (dmn)
November 3, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE; that 1. Defendants' motion for summary judgment on Plaintiff's excessive force claim ( 26 , 31 ) be DENIED; 2. Plaintiff's § 1983 excessive force claim be SET for trial by jury. It is further ORDERED that on or before November 17, 2010 the parties may file objections to the Recommendation. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/3/2010. (jg, )
February 8, 2008 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $3.93 be paid on or before 2/28/2008; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Easterling Correctional Facility. Signed by Judge Wallace Capel Jr. on 2/8/2008. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. Sconyers et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Robert West, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Sconyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. I. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Tew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Peavey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?