Norman v. State of Alabama et al (INMATE3)

Plaintiff: Alphonso Norman
Defendant: State of Alabama, Bruce Pearson and Troy King
Case Number: 2:2008cv00229
Filed: March 28, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the 22 RECOMMENDATION; overruling the 27 Objection; denying the petition 1 for habeas corpus; denying the 27 MOTION for de novo hearing; dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 1/13/2010. (br, )
December 17, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court VACATED PURSUANT TO 26 ORDER. ORDER adopting the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate; denying Petitioner's 1 petition for a writ of habeas corpus; dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 12/17/2009. (br, ) Modified on 1/5/2010 (cc, ).
November 23, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 USC 2254 be denied and this case dismissed with prejudice, because (1) Norman fails to establish a basis for federal habeas relief and (2) his petition is time-barred. Objections to R&R due by 12/6/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 11/23/09. (sl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman v. State of Alabama et al (INMATE3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alphonso Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?