Lloyd v. Marshall et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Derrick M. Lloyd
Defendant: David T. Marshall, Robert Thompson, S. Talley, David Henderson and Sylvester Martin
Case Number: 2:2008cv00419
Filed: June 3, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2012 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the plaintiff filed a 93 Notice of Appeal filed on April 30, 2012. Pursuant to the provisions of the Prison Litigation Reform Act, 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (as amended), the plaintiff is required to pay the requisite $455.00 fee for filing this notice of appealas further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 05/01/12. Copies mailed to plaintiff, Account Clerk @ Downstate Correctional Facility; Furnished to Cashier and Financial Section. (ydw, )
September 21, 2011 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER construing Motion for Permission to File an Interlocutory Appeal as an Objection to 83 Order; Plf's 84 Objection to the Magistrate Judge's Order is OVERRULED; further ORDERED that this case is hereby REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 9/21/2011. (wcl, )
September 19, 2008 36 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by Derrick M. Lloyd, 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Derrick M. Lloyd; it is the Recommendation of the Mag Judge that: 1) The motion for preliminary injunction filed by the plaintiff on 9/18/08 doc. 34 be denied; 2) This case be referred back to the undersigned for additional proceedings; Objections to R&R due by 10/3/2008. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/19/08. (vma, )
September 3, 2008 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing 28 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by Derrick M. Lloyd; It is further Ordered that on or before 9/23/08 defendant Henderson shall file a special report and answer in accordance with the orders of this court. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/3/08. (vma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lloyd v. Marshall et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick M. Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David T. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvester Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?