United States of America v. Gumbaytay et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jamarlo K. Gumbaytay, Matthew Bahr, Brett Rosenbaum, Estate of Donna Greene, Lori Williams, Sean McDonough, Woody D. Franklin, Woody D. Franklin, Sr., James F. Clark, Barbara Clark and Frank Cook
Case Number: 2:2008cv00573
Filed: July 17, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Accomodations Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 42:3601 Fair Housing Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2011 378 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that all claims brought against Jamarlo Gumbaytay in above referenced case are DISMISSED. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to dismiss him as a party to this lawsuit as further set out in this order. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Fuller on 5/24/2011. (jg, )
January 11, 2011 257 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER; that Williams's Motion to Reconsider, or in the alternative Motion to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal 199 is DENIED. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 1/11/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(jg, )
August 23, 2010 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; that on or before August 30, 2010, defendant Jewel Manahan and counsel for the plaintiff shall conduct a face-to-face settlement conference at which they shall engage in good faith settlement negotiations. If settlement cannot be reached, they shall also discuss whether mediation will assist the parties in reaching settlement. Not more than FIVE (5) DAYS after this conference, counsel for the plaintiff shall file a pleading titled "Amended Notice Concerning Settlement Conference and Mediation." Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 8/23/2010. (jg, )
July 26, 2010 190 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; that pro se defendant Jewel Manahan shall be required to show cause why she should not be sanctioned for failing to participate in the settlement conference by no later than 5:00 p.m. on Friday, August 20, 2010. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 7/26/2010. (jg, )
July 23, 2010 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding the Court's mediation program as further set out. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 7/23/2010. (jg, )
June 15, 2010 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; Upon consideration of the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel 182 filed on June7, 2010, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 6/15/2010. (jg, )
March 23, 2010 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; that the Court hereby provides notice to the plaintiff that the Court finds that plaintiff has failed to cause service to be made upon the following defendant: Terrill Jorgensen, within 120 days after the filing of the Complaintin this action. It is the present intention of this Court to dismiss all claims against Terrill Jorgensen without prejudice on March 31, 2010, unless plaintiff shows good cause for its failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4 before that date. Show Cause Response due by 3/31/2010. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 3/23/2010. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Gumbaytay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Amber Standridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamarlo K. Gumbaytay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Bahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Donna Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woody D. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woody D. Franklin, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?