Dobbins v. Giles et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: William Geoffery Dobbins
Defendant: J. C. Giles, Correctional Medical Services, Richard Allen, Sergeant Hewlett and Alabama Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2008cv00581
Filed: July 22, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2011 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the Jury Selection and Trial of this cause are set for August 22, 2011, at 10:00 a.m. at the Frank M. Johnson, Jr. United States Courthouse Complex, Courtroom 2FMJ, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama; further ORDERED that Uni ted States Magistrate Judge Susan Russ Walker shall take care of subpoenaing any witnesses on behalf of plaintiff William Geoffery Dobbins, including entering any appropriate orders regarding such matters. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/20/11. (Furnished to Calendar, AG, ADOC Transport and USM.)(scn, )
October 20, 2008 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: (1) Plaintiff's 86 Objections are overruled; (2) the 81 Magistrate Judge's Recommendation is adopted; (3) Plaintiff's 65 and 78 Motions for Preliminary Injunction are denied; and (4) This case is referred back to the United States magistrate Judge for further appropriate proceedings. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 10/20/2008. (cb, )
October 3, 2008 81 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: (1) the 65 and 78 Motions for preliminary injunction be denied; (2) this case be referred back to the magistrate judge for additional proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 10/16/2008. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 10/3/08. (sl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dobbins v. Giles et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Geoffery Dobbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. C. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Hewlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?