Cope v. Thoamios (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Anthony Earl Cope
Defendant: Russell Thoamios
Case Number: 2:2008cv00761
Filed: September 17, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 18, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT is hereby entered in favor of the defendant and against the plaintiff, and that this action be and is hereby dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to FRCP 58. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 2/18/2009. (dmn)
January 27, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be dismissed without prejudice as further set out in order. Objections to R&R due by 2/10/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 1/27/09. (sl, )
September 18, 2008 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to inmate account clerk at the Kilby Correctional Facility and plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 9/18/08. (sl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cope v. Thoamios (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Earl Cope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Thoamios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?