Sykes v. Nettles (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Andre Jermaine Sykes
Defendant: Sylvester Nettles
Case Number: 2:2008cv00844
Filed: October 21, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Bullock
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that: 1) The 16 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; 2) This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 4/24/2009. (wcl, )
April 1, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that this case be dismissed without prejudice; Objections to R&R due by 4/14/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 4/1/2009. (wcl, )
October 23, 2008 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full, as further set out in order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Bullock County Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 10/23/08. Furnished to cashier. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sykes v. Nettles (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Jermaine Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvester Nettles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?