Couch v. Patrick et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Johnnifer Couch
Defendant: Fitz Patrick, Lakefia Rundolph, CO I Davis and CO I Walker
Case Number: 2:2008cv00859
Filed: October 28, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Bullock
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that on or before 8/31/2009 the plf shall file a response to the written reports filed by the dfts, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 8/11/2009. (wcl, )
June 30, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that on or before 7/15/2009 General Counsel for the AL DOC shall show cause why he has failed to file a response in compliance with the directives of the 32 Order to Show Cause; Show Cause Response due by 7/15/2009. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 6/30/2009. (wcl, )
April 23, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that on or before 5/4/09 General Counsel for the ADOC shall show cause why defendant Walker has failed to file an answer and special report in compliance with the orders of this court as further set out in order; The Clerk is directed to provide GC for the ADOC with a copy of order. Show Cause Response due by 5/4/2009. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 4/23/09 . (mailed order as directed to GC/ADOC(vma, ).
March 4, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE it is Ordered that on or before 3/19/09 defendant Yolanda Walker shall show cause why she has failed to file an answer and special report in compliance with the orders of this court; Show Cause Response due by 3/19/2009; The Clerk is directed to provide General Counsel for the ADOC with a copy of order. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 3/4/09. (GC/ADOC mailed as directed)(vma, )
January 30, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 15 Report and Recommendations; granting 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Johnnifer Couch; the claims against defendant Officer Fitz Patrick are dismissed with prejudice; defendant Officer Fitz Patrick is dismissed as a party to this cause of action; and this case, with respect to the plaintiff's claims against the remaining dfts, is referred back to the mag judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 1/30/09. (vma, )
December 18, 2008 15 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Johnnifer Couch, it is the Recommendation of the Mag Judge that: The plaintiff's motion to dismiss be granted; The claims against officer Fitzpatrick be dismissed with prejudice; Offi cer Fitzpatrick be dismissed as a party to this cause of action; This case, with respect to the plaintiff's claims against the remaining defendants, be referred back to the undersigned for additional proceedings; Objections to R&R due by 12/30/2008. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 12/18/08. (vma, )
October 30, 2008 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at BCCF; cashier. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 10/30/08. (vma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Couch v. Patrick et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnifer Couch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fitz Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakefia Rundolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO I Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO I Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?