Cameron v. Daniels et al(INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Jimmy Frank Cameron
Defendant: Warden Daniels, D. Williams, Officer Moore, Lt. Coach, Sgt. King, Officer Staples, Deputy Warden Billups and Captain Crow
Case Number: 2:2008cv00916
Filed: November 19, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 64 Report and Recommendations; denying plaintiff's 61 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; that this case is referred back to the magistrate judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 9/17/2010. (cc, )
June 23, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing 62 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 6/23/2010. (cc, )
April 27, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that 45 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; (2) The plaintiff's April 7,2009 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED; (3) The claims against officers Williams and Moore be DISMISSED without prejudice; (4) Officer Williams and Moore be dismissed as parties to this cause of action; and (5) This case, with the respect to the plaintiff's deliberate indifference claims against the remaining defendants, be referred back to the undersigned for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 4/27/2009. (cb, )
April 9, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that: (1) The plaintiff's 43 Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED; (2) The claims against officers Williams and Moore be dismissed without prejudice; and (3) Officers Williams and Moore be dismissed as parties to this cause of action; and (4) This case, with the respect to the plaintiff's deliberate indifference claim against the remaining defendants, be referred back to the undersigned for additional proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 4/22/2009. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 4/9/2009. (cb, )
November 21, 2008 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Kilby Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 11/21/2008. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cameron v. Daniels et al(INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Frank Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Daniels
Represented By: Bettie J. Carmack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Williams
Represented By: Bettie J. Carmack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Moore
Represented By: Bettie J. Carmack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Coach
Represented By: Bettie J. Carmack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. King
Represented By: Bettie J. Carmack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden Billups
Represented By: Bettie J. Carmack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Crow
Represented By: Bettie J. Carmack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?