Thompson v. Upshaw (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Joseph Thompson
Defendant: Leroy Upshaw and Eddie Ingram
Case Number: 2:2008cv00931
Filed: November 25, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION directing that upon an independent review of the file in this case and upon consideration of the 33 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereb y ADOPTED and that: (1.) The defendants' 23 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED; (2.) Judgment is GRANTED in favor of the defendants; (3.) This case is DISMISSED with prejudice; (4.) The costs of this proceeding are taxed against the plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 12/14/10. (scn, )
November 19, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint directing that it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: (1.) The defendants' motion for summary judgment be GRANTED; (2.) Judgment be GRANTED in favor of the defendants; (3.) This case be dismissed with prejudice; (4.) The costs of this proceeding be taxed against the plaintiff; further ORDERED that on or before December 3, 2010 the parties may file objections to this Recommendation, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 11/19/10. (scn, )
January 9, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION; Ordered that the 6 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is adopted and that: (1) plaintiff's claims against the Barbour County Sheriff's Department is DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process; (2) the Barb our County Sheriff's Department is DISMISSED as a defendant in this cause of action; (3) this case, with respect to the plaintiff's claims against defendants Upshaw and Ingram are referred back to the Magistrate Judge for appropriate proceedings. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 1/9/09. (sl, )
December 15, 2008 6 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: (1) plaintiff's claims against the Barbour County Sheriff's Department be dismissed with prejudice prior to service of process; (2) the Barbour Co. Sheriff's Department be dismissed as a def endant in this cause of action; (3) this case, with respect to the plaintiff's claims against defendants Upshaw and Ingram, be referred back to the Magistrate Judge for appropriate proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 12/28/2008. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 12/15/08. (sl, ) Modified on 12/16/2008 to correct the docket text reflecting the Objection deadline as 12/28/2008 and not 12/28/2009. (wcl, ).
December 3, 2008 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and Barbour Co. Jail inmate account clerk. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 12/3/08. (sl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Upshaw (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Upshaw
Represented By: Daryl Lynn Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Ingram
Represented By: Daryl Lynn Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?