Thompson v. Barbour County Sheriff's Department et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Joseph Thompson
Defendant: Barbour County Sheriff's Department, The Eufaula Tribune, Tiffany Woo and Eddie Ingram
Case Number: 2:2008cv00932
Filed: November 25, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and that: 1. The plaintiff's 42 U.S.C. 1983 claims against the Barbour County Sheriff's Department, The Eufaula Tribune, Tiffany Woo and Eddie Ingram are DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(I). 2. This case is DISMISSED prior to service of process. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 1/12/2009. (dmn)
December 15, 2008 4 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the plaintiff's 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint against the Barbour County Sheriff's Department, The Eufuala Tribune, Tiffany Woo and Eddie Ingram be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). This case be dismissed prior to service of process. Objections to R&R due by 12/28/2008. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 12/15/2008. (dmn)
December 3, 2008 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Barbour County Jail. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 12/3/2008. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Barbour County Sheriff's Department et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbour County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Eufaula Tribune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?