Colonial Bank v. Syntellect, Inc.

Plaintiff: Colonial Bank
Defendant: Syntellect, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2008cv00955
Filed: December 4, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Montgomery
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2010 149 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, the court having been informed that this cause is now settled, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that this lawsuit is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, as further set out in order; further ORDERING that all pending m otions are denied as moot; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 10/28/10. Furnished to calendar group & AG (terminates Jury Selection 01/10/2011; Jury Trial 01/10/2011).(djy, )
September 20, 2010 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing Jury Trial in this cause to 1/10/2011 before Honorable Myron H. Thompson, with all deadlines expressly tied to this trial date adjusted accordingly. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 9/20/10. (djy, )
June 14, 2010 103 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying plf's 91 motion for leave to file a second amended complaint, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 6/14/10. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colonial Bank v. Syntellect, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colonial Bank
Represented By: Carrie Ellis McCollum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syntellect, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?