Bullock v. Bates et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: James Timothy Bullock
Defendant: Dr. Bates, Gina Savage, Montgomery County Commissioners, D. T. Marshall and Q.C. Heath Care Montgomery County Jail
Case Number: 2:2008cv00977
Filed: December 11, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the 5 Report and Recommendation is adopted and that: 1) Plf's claims against the Montgomery County Commissioners be DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii i); 2) The Montgomery County Commissioners be DISMISSED as dfts to this cause of action; and 3) This case with respect to Plf's claims against the remaining dfts be referred back to the Magistrate Judge for appropriate proceedings. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 1/7/2009. (wcl, )
December 17, 2008 5 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: 1) Plf's claims against the Montgomery County Commissioners be DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (iii); 2) The M ontgomery County Commissioners be DISMISSED as dfts to this cause of action; and 3) This case with respect to Plf's claims against the remaining dfts be referred back to the undersigned for appropriate proceedings; Objections to R&R due by 12/30/2008. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 12/17/2008. (wcl, )
December 16, 2008 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Montgomery County Detention Facility. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 12/16/2008. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bullock v. Bates et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Timothy Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. T. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q.C. Heath Care Montgomery County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?