Walker v. Biggs et al (INMATE 3)

Plaintiff: Allen Walker
Defendant: Barry Biggs and D. Rosado
Case Number: 2:2008cv00994
Filed: December 16, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: 1) Dfts' 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment be GRANTED; 2) Walker's complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice due to Walker's failure to properly exhaust his available administrative remedies; Objections to R&R due by 11/10/2009. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 10/28/2009. (wcl, )
March 13, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that on or before 3/27/2009, Plf shall forward to the Clerk of this Court the sum of $16.73 as an initial partial filing fee in this action, as further set out in order; Filing Fee due by 3/27/2009. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 3/13/2009. (wcl, )
February 5, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time; Plf is GRANTED an extension from 1/29/2009, to and including 2/17/2009, to forward to the Clerk of this Court the sum of $16.73 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 2/5/2009. (wcl, )
January 9, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $16.73 be paid on or before 1/29/2009; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk Maxwell Federal Prison Camp. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 1/9/2009. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Biggs et al (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Rosado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?