Henley et al v. McGriff et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Richard Henley
Defendant: Seven McGriff, William Wynn, Velinda Weatherly and Steve McGill
Case Number: 2:2008cv01004
Filed: December 19, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 24 Report and Recommendations, and that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 6/30/2009. (wcl, )
June 9, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Mag Judge that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice; Objections to R&R due by 6/22/2009. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 6/9/09. (djy, )
January 9, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: 1) Plf's claims against the Alabama Board of Pardons and Paroles and the State of Alabama be DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process under 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and/or (iii); 2) The Alabama Board of Pardons and Paroles and the State of Alabama be DISMISSED as parties to this cause of action; 3) This case be referred back to the undersigned for further proceedings; Objections to R&R due by 1/22/2009. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/9/2009. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henley et al v. McGriff et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seven McGriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velinda Weatherly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Henley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?