Johnson v. The Alabama Board of Pardon and Paroles et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Larry Johnson
Defendant: The Alabama Board of Pardon and Paroles and The State of Alabama
Case Number: 2:2009cv00011
Filed: January 5, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Barbour
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by Larry Johnson, that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 6/22/2009. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr. on 6/9/2009. (dmn)
February 24, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's claims for monetary damages against Defendants Wynn, McGill, and Weatherly be DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(iii); that Plaintiff's claim s arising from actions which occurred prior to January 5, 2007 be DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(e)(2)(B)(i); that Plaintiff's claims against the Alabama Board of Pardons and Paroles be DISM ISSED with prejudice prior to service of process under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); that the Alabama Board of Pardons and Paroles be DISMISSED as a party to this cause of action; that Plaintiff's challenge to Defendants' decision to d eny him parole and his request for injunctive relief, construed as a request for a new parole consideration hearing, be referred back to the magistrate judge for additional proceedings; Objections to R&R due by 3/10/2009. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 2/24/2009. (cc, ) Copies mailed to General Counsel for the Alabama Board of Pardons and Paroles, to General Counsel for the ADOC, and to Alabama Attorney General.
January 26, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Easterling CF. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/26/2009. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. The Alabama Board of Pardon and Paroles et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Alabama Board of Pardon and Paroles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?