Gadsden v. Montgomery County Sheriff's Department et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Derrick Gadsden
Defendant: Montgomery County Sheriff's Department, Wendy Briggs and Lee Esco
Case Number: 2:2009cv00018
Filed: January 7, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the 27 Recommendation; dismissing the case without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 10/14/2011. (br, )
January 9, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Mag Judge that: (1) plf's claims against the Montgomery County Sheriff's Department be dismissed with prejudice prior to service of process in accordance with the directives of 28 USC 1915(3)(2)(B)(i); (2) the Montgomery County Sheriff's Department be dismissed as a defendant in this cause of action; (3) this case, with respect to the plf's claims against defs Briggs and Esco, be referred back to the undersigned for appropriate proceedings; Objections to R&R due by 1/22/2009. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 1/9/09. (djy, )
January 7, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order as further set out in order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at MCDF; furn: cashier. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 1/7/09. (vma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gadsden v. Montgomery County Sheriff's Department et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Gadsden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Esco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?