Bennefield v. Morris et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Joseph Bennefield
Defendant: Nikka Morris and Deloris O'Hara
Case Number: 2:2009cv00054
Filed: January 22, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Elmore
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the 30 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED and that plf's 29 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 6/22/2009. (wcl, )
June 1, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that the plf's 29 MOTION to Dismiss be granted and that this case be dismissed without prejudice; Objections to R&R due by 6/15/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 6/1/2009. (wcl, )
January 29, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Draper Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 1/29/2009. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennefield v. Morris et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bennefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikka Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deloris O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?