Hosey v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Eric Hosey
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections and Earl Savage
Case Number: 2:2009cv00063
Filed: January 23, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Barbour
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 4 Report and Recommendations; dismissing this case with prejudice prior to service of process in accordance with the directives of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii). Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 3/6/2009. (cc, )
February 12, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this case be dismissed with prejudice prior to service of process as required by the directives of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii). Objections to R&R due by 2/25/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 2/12/2009. (cc, )
January 28, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Ventress CF. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 1/28/2009. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hosey v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Hosey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?