Underwood v. Houston County Jail et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Stanley Underwood
Defendant: Houston County Jail, Chris Robertson, Officer Chasen, J. C. Giles and Lt. Longmouth
Case Number: 2:2009cv00069
Filed: January 27, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Barbour
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by Stanley Underwood; it is the Recommendation of the Mag Judge that this case be dismissed without prejudice for failure of the plaintiff to file an amended complaint in accordance with the directive of the order entered in this case on 2/20/09; Objections to R&R due by 4/7/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 3/25/09. (vma, )
February 12, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by Stanley Underwood; it is the Recommendation of the Mag Judge that: 1) The plaintiff's claims against the Houston County Jail be dismissed with prejudice in accordance with the dire ctives of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); 2) The Houston County Jail be dismissed as a defendant in this cause of action; 3) This case, with respect to the plaintiff's claims against the remaining defendants, be referred back to the undersigned for appropriate proceedings; Objections to R&R due by 2/25/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 2/12/09. (vma, )
February 5, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order as further set out in order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at VCF; furn: cashier. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 2/5/09. (vma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Underwood v. Houston County Jail et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Chasen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. C. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Longmouth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?