Ballenger v. Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation, et al

Plaintiff: Ann L. Ballenger
Defendant: Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation, Bell Helicopter Textron, Inc., Edwards & Associates, Inc. and Aeronautical Accessories, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00072
Filed: January 27, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 22, 2011 307 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' motions in limine (Doc. Nos. 291 , 297 , 298 , 300 & 301 and objections (Doc. Nos. 289 , 290 , & 302 , it is ORDERED that counsel for all parties are to do the following: (1) Meet, in person, b y no later than 11/30/2011, to attempt to resolve the motions and objections and (2) File a jointly prepared report by 12/1/2011, (a) as to which issues in the motions and objections are resolved and which ones remain unresolved and (b), for each and every unresolved issue, setting forth in detail the position of each side. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/21/2011. (dmn)
November 4, 2011 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the motions to strike (Doc. Nos. 161 & 178 ), filed by defendant Aeronautical Accessories, Inc., are denied as moot as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/4/2011. (dmn)
November 3, 2011 193 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that defendant Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation's 123 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings is denied as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/3/2011. (dmn)
August 29, 2011 130 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 127 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that defendants Bell Helicopter Textron, Inc. and Edwards & Associates, Inc. and the claims against them are dismissed with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs and with the plaintiffs to satisfy any valid and outstanding liens or subrogation interests. This case is terminated as to these two defendants. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/29/2011. (dmn)
March 18, 2011 114 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: It is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that the 113 Joint Motion for Partial Dismissal is granted and that defendant PHI, Inc. and the claims against it are dismissed with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs. T his case remains pending as to the other defendants. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This case is terminated as to defendant PHI, Inc. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 3/18/2011. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ballenger v. Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann L. Ballenger
Represented By: John Gregory Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation
Represented By: Edward Simmons Sledge, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Helicopter Textron, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwards & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aeronautical Accessories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?