Alverson v. Cummins et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Rodney Alverson
Defendant: John Cummins, Louis Boyd, Bob Riley, Kathy Holt and Richard Allen
Case Number: 2:2009cv00081
Filed: January 30, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2012 135 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) the 22 , 36 , & 46 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment be GRANTED; (2) judgment be GRANTED in favor of the defendants; (3) this case be dismissed with prejudice; (4) the costs of this proceeding be taxed against the plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 8/9/12. (djy, )
December 9, 2009 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff's 106 Objection is OVERRULED. It is further ORDERED that this case is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for appropriate action. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 12/9/2009. (dmn)
November 4, 2009 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 96 Objection to the magistrate judge's Order (Doc. 94 ) denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery (Doc. 93 ) be and is hereby OVERRULED. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 11/4/2009. (dmn)
September 30, 2009 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 85 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED. The plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction be DENIED; and this case be referred back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 9/30/2009. (dmn)
September 9, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the 58 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Rodney Alverson on 7/29/2009 be DENIED. This case be referred back to the undersigned for additional proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 9/25/2009. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 9/9/2009. (dmn)
April 27, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, and it is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. The Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. 2. This case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 4/27/2009. (dmn)
March 27, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: 1) The 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by the plf be DENIED; 2) This case be referred back the undersigned for additional proceedings; Objections to R&R due by 4/13/2009. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 3/27/2009. (wcl, )
February 26, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 3 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk Easterling Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 2/26/2009. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alverson v. Cummins et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Alverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?