Wade v. Moore (INMATE1)

Case Number: 2:2009cv00089
Filed: February 3, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 9 Report and Recommendations; that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for Plaintiff's abandonment of her claim, failure to comply with court's orders, and failure to properly continue prosecution of this case. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 5/4/2009. (cc, )
April 14, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by Charlene P. Wade; it is the Recomm of the Mag Judge that this case be dismissed without prejudice; Objections to R&R due by 4/27/2009. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 4/14/09. (vma, )
February 4, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order as further set out in order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk; furn: cashier at JTP for Women. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 2/4/09. (vma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wade v. Moore (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?