Dees et al v. Colonial BancGroup, Inc. et al (LEAD)

Plaintiff: Patricia Dees and Earl Dees
Defendant: Colonial BancGroup, Inc., Robert E. Lowder, Sarah H. Moore and T. Brent Hicks
Consol Plaintiff: James J. McLaughlin, Eric Crowley, Danny Ray Price and Robert C. Newman
Case Number: 2:2009cv00104
Filed: February 9, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Securities/Commodities Office
County: Elmore
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2014 530 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 3/27/14. (scn, )
September 9, 2013 520 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by The Honorable R. David Proctor on 9/9/2013. (wcl, )
January 7, 2010 278 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 228 Motion to Extend Automatic Stay. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 1/7/2010. (wcl, )
December 2, 2009 269 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 200 Motion to Lift the Stay of Discovery. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 12/2/2009. (wcl, )
May 7, 2009 121 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) The Public Pension Fund Group's 82 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel is granted; (2) The Public Pension Fund Group is appointed lead plf; Labaton Sucharow LLP is appointed lead counsel; and Thomas, Means, Gillis & Seay, PC is appointed liaison counsel; (3) The Parker-McGiffert Group's 76 Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel is denied. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 5/7/2009. (wcl, )
April 17, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) The motions to consolidate, filed in Dees v. Colonial BancGroup, Inc, civil action no. 2:09cv104-MHT (M.D. Ala)(doc. nos. 49 & 50 ); Bozeman v. Colonial BancGroup, Inc, civil action no. 2:09cv124-MHT (M. D. Ala)(doc. no. 33); Myrick v. Colonial BancGroup, Inc, civil action no. 2:09cv149-MHT (M.D. Ala)(doc. no. 17); and Reynolds v. Colonial BancGroup, Inc, civil action no. 2:09cv148-MHT (M.D. Ala)(doc. no. 26), are granted and these cases are consolidated; (2) The lead case is Dees; (3) All future filings by the parties and their attorneys should be in the Dees case only. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 4/17/2009. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dees et al v. Colonial BancGroup, Inc. et al (LEAD)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Dees
Represented By: Kurt B. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Dees
Represented By: Robert E. Battle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial BancGroup, Inc.
Represented By: James Fletcher Hughey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Lowder
Represented By: James Fletcher Hughey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah H. Moore
Represented By: James Fletcher Hughey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Brent Hicks
Represented By: James Fletcher Hughey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: James J. McLaughlin
Represented By: Joel B. Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Eric Crowley
Represented By: Antonio Vozzolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Danny Ray Price
Represented By: Antonio Vozzolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Robert C. Newman
Represented By: Joe Ramon Whatley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?