Woods et al v. Donalds (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Timothy Woods and Ommie J. Woods
Defendant: Officer Donalds
Case Number: 2:2009cv00113
Filed: February 13, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 10 Report and Recommendations; that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for Plaintiff's failures to prosecute this action properly and to comply with the orders of this court. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 5/8/2009. (cc, )
April 17, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be dismissed without prejudice for plaintiff's failures to prosecute this action properly and comply with the orders of this court. Objections to R&R due by 4/30/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 4/17/09. (sl, )
February 19, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that on or before 3/5/09, Plaintiff shall show cause why his 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit filed by Timothy Woods should not be denied. Show Cause Response due by 3/5/2009. Signed by Honorab le Charles S. Coody on 2/19/09. (vma, ) Modified on 2/19/2009 - to correct docket text - to show Plaintiff shall show cause why his 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit filed by Timothy Woods should not be denied. (vma, ).
February 18, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court VACATED PER ORDER OF 2/19/09 - DOC. 5 ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Montgomery City Jail. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 2/18/2009. (cc, ) Modified on 2/19/2009 (vma, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods et al v. Donalds (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ommie J. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Donalds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?