Dickey v. Allen et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Roy Lee Dickey
Defendant: Richard Allen, Alabama Department of Corrections, Louis Boyd, Kenneth Sconyers and Anthony Askews
Case Number: 2:2009cv00134
Filed: February 24, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, upon an independent and de novo review of the file in this case and upon consideration of the recommendation of the magistrate judge, it is ORDERED that the magistrate judge's recommendation (doc. # 50 ) is adopted and that this case is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/20/14. (scn, )
March 13, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: 1) The plf's claims against the AL DOC be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to the directives of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); 2) The AL DOC be dismissed as a dft in this cause of action; 3) This case, with respect to the allegations set forth against the remaining dfts, be referred back to the undersigned for appropriate proceedings; Objections to R&R due by 3/26/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 3/13/2009. (wcl, )
February 26, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Easterling Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 2/26/2009. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickey v. Allen et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Lee Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Sconyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Askews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?