Irvin v. United States Probation Office for the Middle District of Alabama et al(INMATE 3)

Plaintiff: Norman Irvin
Defendant: Larry Turner, United States Probation Office for the Middle District of Alabama and Leslie Hopek
Case Number: 2:2009cv00161
Filed: February 27, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by Norman Irvin, that this case be DISMISSED as moot. Objections to R&R due by 8/11/2009. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 7/29/2009. (dmn)
March 19, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $8.00 be paid on or before 4/8/2009; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Atlanta US Penitentiary. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 3/19/2009. (wcl, )
March 3, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before 3/24/2009, the plaintiff shall file either a prison account statement from the account clerk at the Atlanta U. S. Penitentiary showing the average monthly balance in plaintiff's prison account for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of this complaint and the average monthly deposits to plaintiff's account during the past six months or the $350.00 filing fee. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr. on 3/3/2009. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irvin v. United States Probation Office for the Middle District of Alabama et al(INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Probation Office for the Middle District of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Hopek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?