Danny Lynn Electrical & Plumbing LLC et al v. Veolia ES Solid Waste Southeast, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kevin Potthoff
Defendant: Veolia ES Solid Waste Southeast, Inc., Veolia ES Solid Waste, Veolia Environmental Services and Veolia Environmental Services North America Corporation
Case Number: 2:2009cv00192
Filed: March 6, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2012 445 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that plaintiffs' 436 Objections are overruled and that the magistrate judge's 435 Order is affirmed as further set out in the opinion and order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/4/2012. (dmn, )
March 9, 2012 435 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) 401 SEALED MOTION for sanctions filed by the plaintiffs be and is hereby DENIED; (2) the 421 MOTION to Strike Exhibits "M" and "N" to plaintiffs' motion for sanctions filed by the defendants be and is hereby DENIED; (3) the 434 MOTION for Protective Order filed by the defendants be and is hereby DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 3/9/12. (djy, )
January 4, 2012 413 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 412 Motion for Extension of Time is denied as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/4/2012. (dmn, )
October 3, 2011 371 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: By 365 Order entered on 9/26/2011, this court granted the plaintiffs' 359 Motion to Dismiss and dismissed Jackson's Rocky Ridge Pharmacy, Inc. as a plaintiff. However, Jackson's Rocky Ridge Pharmacy, Inc. is also a counter-d efendant. It is therefore ORDERED that the parties SHOW CAUSE as to why Jackson's Rocky Ridge Pharmacy, Inc. should not also be dismissed and terminated as a counter-defendant. Show Cause Response due by 10/11/2011. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/3/2011. (dmn)
July 19, 2011 310 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that defendants' 177 Motion to Dismiss is: (1) Granted as to the plaintiffs' RICO claims, as further set out in the order. (2) Denied as to the plaintiffs' breach-of-contract claim, as further set out in the order. (3) Granted in part and denied in part as to the plaintiffs' unjust-enrichment claim, as further set out in the order. The plaintiffs' request to amend their complaint again is denied. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/19/2011. (dmn)
December 9, 2010 160 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that defendants' 123 MOTION to Dismiss is: (1) Granted as to plaintiffs' RICO claims, alleged pursuant to 18 U.S.C.A. § 1962 et seq., but with leave to file an amended complaint, setting forth amended RICO claims, w ithin 14 days from the date of this order as further set out in the order. (2) Denied as to plaintiffs' breach-of-contract claim as further set out in the order. (3) Denied as to the unjust-enrichment claim. (4) Granted as to the spoliation claim as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 12/9/2010. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Danny Lynn Electrical & Plumbing LLC et al v. Veolia ES Solid Waste Southeast, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Potthoff
Represented By: James Michael Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veolia ES Solid Waste Southeast, Inc.
Represented By: Rik Standford Tozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veolia ES Solid Waste
Represented By: Rik Standford Tozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veolia Environmental Services
Represented By: Rik Standford Tozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veolia Environmental Services North America Corporation
Represented By: Rik Standford Tozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?