Thompson v. Upshaw et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Joseph Thompson
Defendant: Leroy Upshaw, The Barbour County Sheriff Department and Barbour County Jail Medical Staff
Case Number: 2:2009cv00210
Filed: March 12, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the 4 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED and that: 1) The claims presented by Thompson with respect to actions taken against him during his confinement in the Barbour C ounty Jail are DISMISSED as moot; 2) The claims presented on behalf of other inmates confined in the Barbour County Jail are DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(I) as the plf lacks standing to assert these claims; 3) This case is DISMISSED prior to service of process in accordance with the directives of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(I) and (ii). Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 4/24/2009. (wcl, )
April 2, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: (1) the claims presented by Thompson with respect to actions taken against him during his confinement in the Barbour County Jail be dismissed as moot; (2) the claims presented on behalf of other inmates co nfined in the Barbour County Jail be dismissed with prejudice; (3) this case be dismissed prior to service of process in accordance with the directives of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii). Objections to R&R due by 4/14/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 4/2/09. (sl, )
March 16, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and inmate account clerk at the Joseph V. Conte Facility. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 3/16/09. (sl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Upshaw et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Upshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Barbour County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbour County Jail Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?