Thompson v. Upshaw et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: |
Joseph Thompson |
Defendant: |
Leroy Upshaw, The Barbour County Sheriff Department and Barbour County Jail Medical Staff |
Case Number: |
2:2009cv00210 |
Filed: |
March 12, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama |
Office: |
Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Truman M. Hobbs |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan Russ Walker |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 24, 2009 |
Filing
5
ORDER AND OPINION, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the 4 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED and that: 1) The claims presented by Thompson with respect to actions taken against him during his confinement in the Barbour C ounty Jail are DISMISSED as moot; 2) The claims presented on behalf of other inmates confined in the Barbour County Jail are DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(I) as the plf lacks standing to assert these claims; 3) This case is DISMISSED prior to service of process in accordance with the directives of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(I) and (ii). Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 4/24/2009. (wcl, )
|
April 2, 2009 |
Filing
4
RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: (1) the claims presented by Thompson with respect to actions taken against him during his confinement in the Barbour County Jail be dismissed as moot; (2) the claims presented on behalf of other inmates co nfined in the Barbour County Jail be dismissed with prejudice; (3) this case be dismissed prior to service of process in accordance with the directives of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii). Objections to R&R due by 4/14/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 4/2/09. (sl, )
|
March 16, 2009 |
Filing
3
ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and inmate account clerk at the Joseph V. Conte Facility. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 3/16/09. (sl, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?