Thompson v. Upshaw et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Joseph Thompson
Defendant: Leroy Upshaw, Paul Branson and Ben Reeve
Case Number: 2:2009cv00214
Filed: March 16, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 11/30/2011. (wcl, )
April 2, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Mag Judge that: (1) the plf's claims presented against Paul Brunson and Ben Reeve be DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process in accordance with the directives of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), ( ii) and (iii); (2) plfs challenges to the constitutionality of the criminal charge pending against him before the Circuit Court of Barbour County, Alabama be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) as such claims are not properly before the court at this time; (3) this case, with respect to the plaintiffs claim against Leroy Upshaw alleging a two-day period of illegal imprisonment on a detainer lodged by another state, be referred back to undersigned for additional proceedings; Objections to R&R due by 4/14/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 4/2/09. (djy, )
March 18, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Joseph V. Conte Facility. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 3/18/2009. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Upshaw et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Upshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Reeve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?