Walker v. Albright et al (INMATE3)

Plaintiff: Quandala Denise Walker
Defendant: Frank Albright, Troy King, Chilton County Circuit Court and John Bush
Case Number: 2:2009cv00254
Filed: March 26, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Elmore
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the 8 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED and that the petition for habeas corpus relief is DISMISSED without prejudice to afford Walker an opportunity to exhaust all state court remedies available to her. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 6/22/2009. (wcl, )
May 29, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that the 1 Petition for Habeas Corpus Relief be dismissed without prejudice to afford Walker an opportunity to exhaust all state court remedies available to her; Objections to R&R due by 6/12/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 5/29/2009. (wcl, )
April 20, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that on or before 5/5/2009, Petitioner shall show cause why her petition should not be dismissed for failure to exhaust state court remedies; Show Cause Response due by 5/5/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 4/20/2009. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Albright et al (INMATE3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quandala Denise Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Albright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chilton County Circuit Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?