Glover v. Cummins et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Glover
Defendant: John Cummins, Correctional Medical Services and Nurse Parks
Case Number: 2:2009cv00262
Filed: March 30, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Marion
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING 45 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and that this case be and is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. An appropriate judgment will be entered. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 12/9/2009. (dmn)
November 3, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by Jeffrey Glover that this case be dismissed without prejudice for failure of the plaintiff to comply with the orders of this court. Objections to R&R due by 11/16/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 11/3/2009. (dmn)
March 31, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Hamilton A&I. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 3/31/2009. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glover v. Cummins et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?