Tate et al v. Marshall et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Marcus Orlando Tate and Joe Willie Reese
Defendant: D. T. Marshall, L. T. Rodgers and Quality Correctional Health Care
Case Number: 2:2009cv00277
Filed: April 1, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the 7 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED and that this case be and is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 6/17/2009. (wcl, )
May 22, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that this case be dismissed without prejudice for Reese's failure to provide the court with necessary financial information in compliance with the orders of this court. Objections to R&R due by 6/4/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 5/22/2009. (cb, )
April 14, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that plaintiff's 1 MOTION to Certify Class as a class action be denied. Objections to R&R due by 4/27/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 4/14/2009. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tate et al v. Marshall et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Orlando Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Willie Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. T. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. T. Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Correctional Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?