Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Citibank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00324
Filed: April 10, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Real Property: Foreclosure Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is hereby DECLARED that this case is resolved in favor of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company is entitled to exercise a statutory right of redemption from Citibank, N.A. for the property located at Lot 1 of Belle Arete Subdivision Plat No. 1, as the Plat thereof appears of record in the Office of the Judge of Probate of Montgomery, County in Plat Book 48, Page 96; further ORDERED that Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Citibank, N.A. have 30 days from the date of this Order to resolve the issue of the appropriate amount due to redeem the property, or to advise the court that the issue has not been resolved. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 8/29/2011. (wcl, )
June 22, 2011 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the Portises and Deutsche Bank have until 6/28/2011 to file a supplement to their stipulated facts, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 6/22/2011. (wcl, )
April 25, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER suspending the 4/28/2011 deadlines for exhibit and witness lists and deposition designations pending the pre-trial conference on 5/5/2011. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 4/25/2011. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Louis Michael Calligas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Rik Standford Tozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?