Shirley v. Moore et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: David Allen Shirley
Defendant: Gloria Moore, Chief Stop, Phyllis Billups and Leeposey Daniels
Case Number: 2:2009cv00338
Filed: April 15, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Elmore
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be dismissed without prejudice; Objections to R&R due by 9/14/2009. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 8/31/2009. (wcl, )
April 28, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by David Allen Shirley be DENIED; that this case be referred back the magistrate judge for additional proceedings; Objections to R&R due by 5/14/2009. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 4/28/2009. (cc, )
April 15, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Draper CF. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 4/15/2009. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shirley v. Moore et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Allen Shirley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Stop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis Billups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leeposey Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?