Wingard v. Chilton County Task Force et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Christopher Robin Wingard
Defendant: Chilton County Task Force and Chilton County Jail Doctor
Case Number: 2:2009cv00368
Filed: April 21, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Chilton
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that this case be dismissed without prejudice because of plaintiff's abandonment of his claims, his failure to comply with the orders of this court and his failure to properly continue prosecution of this cause of action. Objections to R&R due by 1/5/2010. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 12/22/2009. (br, )
November 16, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before December 7, 2009 the plaintiff shall file a response to the 29 written report filed by the defendant. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 11/16/09. (br, )
October 27, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION adopting the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 22 ; the plaintiff's claims against the Chilton County Task Force are DISMISSED with prejudice in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(I); the Chi lton County Task Force is DISMISSED as a defendant in this cause of action; this case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings regarding the plaintiff's claim of inadequate medical treatment during his confinement in the Chilton County Jail. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 10/27/09. (br, )
September 24, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: 1) The plf's claims against the Chilton County Task Force be dismissed with prejudice in accordance with the provisions of 28 USC § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); 2) The Chilton County Task Force b e dismissed as a dft in this cause of action; 3) This case be referred back to the undersigned for additional proceedings regarding the plf's claim of inadequate medical treatment during his confinement in the Chilton County Jail; Objections to R&R due by 10/6/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 9/24/2009. (wcl, )
August 12, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by the plf (i) why he has failed to file an amendment to his complaint in accordance with the directives of the order entered on 6/3/2009 and (ii) file the requisite amendment, as further set out in order; Show Cause Response due by 8/24/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 8/12/09. (djy, )
June 8, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 12 motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 6/8/09. (djy, )
June 3, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Kilby Corr Fac, as directed. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 6/3/09. Furnished to cashier. (djy, )
May 20, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting MOTION for Extension of time; further ORDERING that plf is granted an extension from 5/21/09 to an including 6/1/2009 to file the initial filing fee. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 5/20/09. Furnished to cashier.(djy, )
May 12, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the plf an extension from May 7, 2009 to and including May 21, 2009 to file the initial partial filing fee; advising the plf that he should provide jail officials, not this court, with his permission to remove funds from his account for payment of the requisite fee; Filing Fee due by 5/21/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 5/12/09. (djy, )
April 22, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court (VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER ENTERED 6/3/09) ORDER granting 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit filed by Christopher Robin Wingard; Ordered that on or before 5/7/09 the plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of this Court the sum of $5.27 as an initial partial filing fee; Filing Fee due by 5/7/2009; (furn: Chilton Co. Jail account clerk; cashier). Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 4/22/09. (vma, ) Modified on 6/3/2009 (djy, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wingard v. Chilton County Task Force et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Robin Wingard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chilton County Task Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chilton County Jail Doctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?