Stepp v. King (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Michael Stepp
Defendant: Troy King
Case Number: 2:2009cv00383
Filed: April 28, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the court finds 5 objections to be without merit, and they are OVERRULED; that 4 Report and Recommendations is adopted; that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 5/13/2009. (cc, )
May 5, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this case be DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. §1915(e)(2)(B)(i); Objections to R&R due by 5/18/2009. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/5/2009. (cc, )
April 30, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Jefferson County Jail. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 4/30/2009. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stepp v. King (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?