Johnson v. Brooks et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Alvin James Johnson
Defendant: Ellen Brooks and Mike Myrick
Case Number: 2:2009cv00385
Filed: April 29, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 17 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 6/9/09. (vma, )
May 12, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court VACATED PER ORDER OF 5/12/09 - doc. 13 **ORDER that the plaintiff seeks six copies of forms and may therefore receive such copies from the Clerk of this court by submitting prepayment of $3.00. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 5/12/09. (vma, ) Modified on 5/12/2009 (vma, ).
May 5, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by Alvin James Johnson; it is the Recommendation of the Mag Judge that: 1) The plaintiff's claims against defendants Brooks and Myrick be dismissed with prejudice in accordance with t he provisions of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (iii); 2) To the extent Johnson presents a claim challenging the constitutionality of actions occurring in a pending state criminal case, this case be dismissed without prejudice in accordance with the provisions of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); Objections to R&R due by 5/18/2009. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 5/5/09. (vma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Brooks et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin James Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Myrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?