McCary v. Steele et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Stephen Paul McCary
Defendant: Lt. Steele, Correctional Medical Services, Sgt. Rhodes and Staton Healthcare Unit
Case Number: 2:2009cv00405
Filed: May 4, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 24, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice; Objections to R&R due by 12/7/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 11/24/2009. (wcl, )
October 14, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that on or before 11/3/2009 plf shall file a response to the defendants' written reports, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 10/14/09. (djy, )
May 22, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Mag Judge that: (1) Plf's claims against the Staton Health Care Unit be DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); and (2) This case, with respect to the claims presented against the remaining defs, be referred back to the undersigned for additional proceedings; Objections to R&R due by 6/9/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 5/22/09. (djy, )
May 6, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before 5/27/09 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of this Court the sum of $25.33 as an initial partial filing fee; as further set out in order; granting 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit filed by Stephen Paul McCary as further set out in order; mailed account clerk at HCF; cashier. Filing Fee due by 5/27/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 5/6/09. (vma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCary v. Steele et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Paul McCary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staton Healthcare Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?