Walker v. Dinkins et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Lorenzo E. Walker
Defendant: T. Dinkins, F. Fenn, Mark Lowman and Richard Smith
Case Number: 2:2009cv00423
Filed: May 12, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 6 Report and Recommendations; that Plaintiff's complaint under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 is DISMISSED with prejudice, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), due to Plaintiff's failure to allege a constitutional violation. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 9/17/2009. (cc, )
June 23, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); Objections to R&R due by 7/6/2009. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 6/23/2009. (cc, )
June 9, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Easterling CF. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 6/9/2009. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Dinkins et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo E. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Dinkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Fenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Lowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?