Clark v. Smith et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Jermaine Cordell Clark
Defendant: Lt. Smith, S. Hill, CO 1 Thomas and Ms. Belcher
Case Number: 2:2009cv00473
Filed: May 21, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before October 2, 2009 the plaintiff shall file a response to 6 and 19 Special Reports. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 8/27/09. (br, )
August 26, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before September 25, 2009 the defendants shall object or otherwise respond to 16 the interrogatories, request for admissions and request for production of documents submitted by the plaintiff Jermaine Cordell Clark; that the plaint iff shall file no further document related to discovery without permission of the court. The Clerk is DIRECTED to not accept for filing any pleadings, motions or other applications submitted by the plaintiff which are not in compliance with the directives of this order. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 8/26/09. (br, )
May 26, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Ventress CF. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/26/2009. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Smith et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine Cordell Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO 1 Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Belcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?