Gwathney v. Keller et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Charles Gwathney
Defendant: Warden Keller, Captain Normand, Lieuntenant Bell, Correctional Officer Warren and Correctional Officer Burns
Case Number: 2:2009cv00479
Filed: May 22, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2013 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the trial setting in this case is CONTINUED GENERALLY, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/5/13. (Furnished to Calendar/WR)(Term'd: Jury Trial 02/25/2013)(scn, )
January 7, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 71 Motion to compel production of documents, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 1/7/13. (scn, )
January 24, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that a telephone status call is scheduled for 10:00 a.m. C.S.T. on February 3, 2012; Counsel for defendant is DIRECTED to set up the telephone conference call; further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this order to Lisa Shahan, Case Manager, FCI Morgantown, Post office Box 1000, Morgantown, WV 26507, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 1/24/12. (Furnshed to Calendar, JT, and BOP)(Copy mailed as directed.)(scn, )
December 12, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: After an independent evaluation and de novo review; 1. The court finds Warren's 53 Objections to the Recommendation of 10/12/2011, to be meritorious to the extent indicated by the Magistrate Judge in the 54 Supplemental Recommendation of 11/16/2011, and to the extent, Warren's objections to the Recommendation of 10/12/2011 are SUSTAINED. In all other respects, the court finds Warren's 52 Objections to the Recommendation of 10/12/2011, to be without merit, and they are hereby OVERRULED. 2. The court finds Warren's 56 Objections to the 56 Supplemental Recommendation of 11/16/2011 to be without merit, and they are hereby OVERRULED. To the extent indicated above, the court hereby adopts the 49 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge and the 54 Supplemental Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's 48 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 12/12/2011. (dmn, )
May 27, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $31.59 be paid on or before 6/12/09 ; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order as further set out. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Morgantown Federal Corr Inst in Morgantown, West Virginia; furn: cashier. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 5/27/09. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 5/27/09. (vma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gwathney v. Keller et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Gwathney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Normand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieuntenant Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?