White v. Fox et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: John E. White
Defendant: J. S. Fox and Officer Wheat
Case Number: 2:2009cv00481
Filed: May 22, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: St. Clair
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: It is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that: 1. The 20 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED. 2. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 11/6/2009. (dmn)
October 16, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by John E. White, that this case be dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 10/29/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 10/16/2009. (dmn)
May 28, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $3.34 be paid on or before 6/18/2009; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the St. Clair Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 5/28/2009. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Fox et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. S. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Wheat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?