Albright v. Reid et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Anthony Albright
Defendant: Tom Reid, Sibley Reynolds, Whit Moncrief, Central Ala. Drug Task Force and Randall Houston
Case Number: 2:2009cv00503
Filed: May 28, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court [VACATED AND STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD PURSUANT TO COURT 10 ORDER.] ORDER denying 6 Motion to Review Video Tapes of a controlled drug transaction. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 6/11/2009. (dmn) Modified on 6/11/2009 (dmn).
June 3, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court [WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER ENTERED 6/11/2009.] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that: 1. The plaintiff's claims against Tom Reid and the Central Alabama Drug Task Enforcement Agency arising from plaintiff's 2003 arrest be DISMISSED with p rejudice pursuant to the directives of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) as the plaintiff failed to file the complaint within the time prescribed by the applicable period of limitations; 2. The plaintiff's claims against Sibley Reynolds and Whit Moncrief be DISMISSED with prejudice in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), (ii) and (iii); 3. To the extent the plaintiff presents claims challenging the constitutionality of the controlled substance conviction impo sed upon him by the Circuit Court of Autauga County, Alabama, these claims be DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to the directives of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); 4. This case be dismissed prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), (ii) and (iii). Objections to R&R due by 6/15/2009. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 6/3/2009. (cc, ) Modified on 6/11/2009 (dmn).
June 1, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Atmore Community Work Center. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 6/1/2009. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albright v. Reid et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Albright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sibley Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whit Moncrief
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Ala. Drug Task Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?