Robinson v. State of Alabama (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Clayton Dean Robinson
Defendant: State of Alabama
Case Number: 2:2009cv00572
Filed: June 18, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure of the plaintiff to prosecute this action. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 8/19/2009. (dmn)
July 28, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this case be dismissed without prejudice for failure of the plaintiff to prosecute this action; Objections to R&R due by 8/10/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 7/28/2009. (cc, )
June 19, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Staton Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 6/19/2009. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. State of Alabama (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Dean Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?