Pennington v. Giles et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Keko Pennington
Defendant: J. C. Giles and Troy King
Case Number: 2:2009cv00576
Filed: June 19, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION that 17 Report and Recommendations is ADOPTED and that the petition for habeas corpus relief filed by Keko Pennington is DENIED and DISMISSED with prejudice as time-barred. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 5/24/2011. (cc, )
August 28, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by petitioner why his 1 federal Habeas petition should not be denied as it was not filed within the one-year limitation period established by 28 U.S.C. § 2244(d)(1); Show Cause Response due by 9/18/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 8/28/09. (djy, )
July 16, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that 8 Motion to Amend is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this order and the amended petition to the Attorney General for the State of Alabama and to Warden J.C. Giles. Respondents shall file an answer to the petition, as amended, on or before 8/10/09. ORDERED that Respondents are GRANTED an extension from July 24, 2009 to and including August 10, 2009 to file their answer to the petition, as amended. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 7/16/2009. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennington v. Giles et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keko Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. C. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?