Jones v. Allen et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Sylvester Jones
Defendant: Richard Allen, Kenneth Jones, Sandra Giles, Renee Mason, Meca Johnson, Sandra Cooper, Tasha Johnson, Sylvester Nettles, Lt. McCraney, Lt. Hicks, Lt. Burney, A. Jackson and Timothy Scott
Case Number: 2:2009cv00597
Filed: June 24, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Bullock
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2009 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that 53 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED and plaintiff's motion to certify case as a class action is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 11/19/2009. (cb, )
September 8, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that: (1) Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED; (2) The plaintiff's claims against Anthony Jackson, Sandra Cooper, Tasha Johnson, Lloyd Hicks, Michael McCraney and Jerome Burney be dismissed with prejudice; (3 )Anthony Jackson, Sandra Cooper, Tasha Johnson, Lloyd Hicks, Michael McCraney and Jerome Burney be dismissed as parties to this cause of action; (4) This case, with respect to the plaintiff's claims against the remaining defendants, be referred back to the undersigned for additional proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 9/20/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 9/8/2009. (cb, )
September 4, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that 54 Objection to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is OVERRULED; (2) The 46 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; (3) The Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED; and (4) This case is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 9/4/2009. (cb, )
August 17, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the motion for preliminary injunction filed by the plaintiff be DENIED; that this case be referred back to the undersigned for additional proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 8/30/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 8/17/09. (br, )
June 25, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk Bullock County Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 6/25/2009. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Allen et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvester Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meca Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasha Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvester Nettles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. McCraney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Burney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?