American Home Assurance Company v. Weaver Aggregate Transport, Inc.

Plaintiff: American Home Assurance Company
Defendant: Weaver Aggregate Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00612
Filed: June 30, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 63 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint is DENIED as further set out in the order. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 6/30/2010. (dmn)
April 12, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion for Stay of Time for Defendant to Respond to Requests for Production of Documents. The thirty-day period under which third-party defendant Beacon Industrial Staffing, Inc. ("Beacon") must respond to Weaver Aggrega te Transport, Inc.'s requests for production of documents is stayed until such time as the Court has ruled upon the pending motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (Doc. 36 ), filed by Beacon on 2/26/2010. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 4/12/2010. (dmn)
February 17, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 32 Motion for Extension of Time; Plaintiff and Defendant shall be required to show cause why this motion should not be granted by no later than 5:00 p.m. on Monday, February 22; Third Party Defendant may file a reply by no later than 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, February 25. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/17/2010. (jg, )
February 10, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: In light of this Court's order denying Defendant's motion for summary judgment as premature (Doc. 30 ), it is hereby ORDERED that the 27 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Responses to Pending Motion for Summary Judgment-II is DENIED as moot. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/10/2010. (dmn)
February 8, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that, in light of the fact that a 25 Third Party Complaint has been filed in this case and the third-party defendant has yet to make an appearance, Defendant's 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment is DENIED as premature and with leave to re-file no later than the 5/21/2010 deadline for dispositive motions (see Doc. 11 . Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/8/2010. (dmn)
February 2, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Responses to Pending Motion for Summary Judgment - II; ORDERED that a Status Conference is set for 2/5/2010, at 08:30 AM by conference call arranged by counsel for Plf before Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller, as further set out in order. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/2/2010. (furn: yg, hc, kg)(wcl, )
January 22, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint. Defendant shall file his Third-Party Complaint on or before 1/28/2010. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 1/22/2010. (dmn)
January 19, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff TO SHOW CAUSE as to why the 21 Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, 2/2/2010. Defendant may file a reply by no later than 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, 2/9/2010. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 1/19/2010. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Home Assurance Company v. Weaver Aggregate Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Home Assurance Company
Represented By: Stephen Richard Shows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weaver Aggregate Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?