Conkle v. State of Alabama Department of Corrections (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Norman Joseph Conkle, II
Defendant: State of Alabama Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2009cv00628
Filed: July 6, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: St. Clair
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that Plf's 10 MOTION to Dismiss be GRANTED and that this case be dismissed without prejudice; Objections to R&R due by 10/21/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 10/8/2009. (wcl, )
September 4, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that on or before 9/18/2009, plf shall file a second amended complaint, as further set out in order; directing the clerk to furnish plf with a form for use in filing a complaint under 42 USC 1983, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 9/4/09. Mailed w/form to plf, as directed.(djy, )
August 27, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that on or before 9/11/2009, Plf shall file and amended complaint on a form for use in filing a 42 USC 1983 complaint, as further set out in order; DIRECTING the Clerk to furnish Plf with a form for use in filing a complaint under 42 USC 1983. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 8/27/2009. (wcl, )
July 20, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $4.16 be paid on or before 8/10/2009; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 3 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at St. Clair Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 7/20/2009.(wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conkle v. State of Alabama Department of Corrections (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Joseph Conkle, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?